U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60598-
  • Case Name: RILEY COLVER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
August, 2019
  • August 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • August 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Approving Stipulation]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.