U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60604-
  • Case Name: CAROL H. SERQUINA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • July 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
June, 2019
  • June 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • June 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Filing Fees in Installments(1st Inst. Not Included)]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.