U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60617-
  • Case Name: ERIN MICHAEL BUCKLEY and KELSEY JOHANNA TOMSHECK-BUCKLEY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
October, 2020
  • October 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
September, 2020
  • September 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Avoid Lien]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Avoid Judicial Lien]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • September 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Sale of Property]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Approving Sale of Property]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • July 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
June, 2019
  • June 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.