U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60631-
  • Case Name: DARIN SHAW and CORINNA MICHELS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • February 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Approval - BK]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • January 01, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • November 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Pay]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order (Generic)]
  • June 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
  • June 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Pay]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Pay ]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Turnover]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
February, 2020
  • February 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Approval - BK]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Judicial Notice]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • February 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Complaints Deadline]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
January, 2020
  • January 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
December, 2019
  • December 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • December 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Determintation That Property Shall Remain Property of the Estate]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Determination That Property Shall Remain Property of the Estate]
  • November 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Terminate original trustee and appoint new trustee]
October, 2019
  • October 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Trustee's Objection to Exemption]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Sustaining Trustee's Objection to Exemptions]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Trustee's Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.