U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60629-
  • Case Name: ZOEY ZOCO VANNATTA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.