U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60639-
  • Case Name: MARTY NEIL PRESTON and AMANDA SUE PRESTON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2019
  • October 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Add Judge]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.