U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00019-
  • Case Name: DRUMMOND v. DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Close Adversary Case]
August, 2019
  • August 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • August 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • August 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Default Judgment]
  • August 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • August 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Default Judgment]
  • August 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Entry of Default]
  • August 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service]
  • August 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.