U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60693
  • Case Name: RIMROCK GRAINS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Interim Fees]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • March 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Interim Fees]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Sell]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Expedite Hearing - BK]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
February, 2020
  • February 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • December 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • December 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Time]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • November 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Shorten Time]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Sell]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Expedite Hearing - BK]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Time]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • September 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
August, 2019
  • August 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Vacating Order]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Corp./Part.)]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Change Venue]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Change Venue]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.