U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60709-
  • Case Name: KRISTIE LOUISE AZURE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2020
  • April 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • August 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Approving Filing Fees in Installments(1st Inst. Included)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.