U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60717-
  • Case Name: JEREMY GEORGE LAUGHLIN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application of Chapter 7 fee waiver under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.