U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60739-
  • Case Name: STEVE SHUPAK
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
November, 2019
  • November 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • October 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Denying Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.