U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60751-
  • Case Name: JOSHUA GRAY and PERTRISHA GRAY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • October 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
July, 2019
  • July 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.