U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60758-
  • Case Name: JOHN D CLOER and SHERON J CLOER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.