U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00020-
  • Case Name: CORPORATION v. CRANE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • September 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • September 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding ]
  • September 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • September 06, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service]
  • September 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.