U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60767-
  • Case Name: GEORGE CLIFTON GLADBACK
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 13)]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 13 Case]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignment/Transfer of Claim]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • July 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 13)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch. 13 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Modify Plan]
  • June 03, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
May, 2021
  • May 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
  • May 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • April 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
March, 2021
  • March 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 13)]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch. 13 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
April, 2020
  • April 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignmen/Transfer of Claim]
March, 2020
  • March 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • January 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.