U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00021-
  • Case Name: WOMACK v. ENGLISH et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - ADV]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Close Adversary Case]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion]
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - ADV]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 06, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.