U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60811-
  • Case Name: STONE CONTRACTING LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Converting Case]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Corp./Part.)]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [DEACTIVATED EVENT Convert Case 11 to 7]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Convert Case Chapter 11 to Chapter 7]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Convert Case Chapter 11 to Chapter 7]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice - BK]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.)]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.