open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Montana

MONTANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Montana
    Case Number:19-60814-
    Party Name:RONALD E. HUBER and CYNTHIA M. HUBER
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Reopen Case (Fee Not Applicable)]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Reopen Case - BK]
    Date Published:September 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:September 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?83052
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =