U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60841-
  • Case Name: GILBERT DURHAM COUTS and ELIZABETH ELENA COUTS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Delay Discharge]
  • November 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Delay Discharge]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reconsider Dismissal of Case]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Reconsider Dismissal of Case]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Reconsider Dismissal of Case]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.