U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00022-
  • Case Name: CRUM v. ROSS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • January 29, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding ]
  • January 14, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • November 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Approving Stipulation]
  • November 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order (Generic)]
September, 2019
  • September 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service]
  • September 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.