U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60871-
  • Case Name: VINCENT EDWIN NAGEL and ANN MARIE NAGEL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
May, 2021
  • May 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Avoid Lien]
  • May 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Avoid Judicial Lien]
April, 2021
  • April 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Avoid Lien]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Avoid Judicial Lien]
  • April 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien]
  • April 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Avoid Lien]
  • April 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Avoid Judicial Lien]
  • April 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
December, 2020
  • December 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • December 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • December 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
January, 2020
  • January 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Vacating Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Delay Discharge]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Delay Discharge]
September, 2019
  • September 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application of Chapter 7 fee waiver under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • September 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.