U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60889-
  • Case Name: KRISTOPHER DANIEL STUDENY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Redeem]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Redeem]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
November, 2019
  • November 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Redeem]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application of Chapter 7 fee waiver under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.