U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60891-
  • Case Name: MICHAEL SEAN SHEETS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
November, 2019
  • November 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.