U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60900
  • Case Name: MOUNTAIN HOME- MONTANA VACATION RENTALS LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Assume/Reject Lease]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Assume/Reject Lease]
  • January 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Convert Case Chapter 11 to Chapter 7]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ballot Report]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Assume/Reject Lease]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement and Setting Ch. 11 Plan Confirmation Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
September, 2019
  • September 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.)]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.