open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Montana

MONTANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Montana
    Case Number:19-60908-
    Party Name:DOUGLAS J JELLISON and MARY CATHERINE JELLISON
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
    Date Published:October 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?83147
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =