U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00024-
  • Case Name: WOMACK v. MUFG UNION BANK, N.A., D/B/A UNION BANK
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - ADV]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • January 29, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Dismissing Proceedings]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • October 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Entry of Default]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.