U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60921
  • Case Name: CARRIE JO FERLICKA-CYR
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2021
  • December 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Final Decree]
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Final Decree]
  • December 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Discharging Debtor(s) in a Chapter 11 Case]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
October, 2021
  • October 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Approval]
  • October 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Approval]
September, 2021
  • September 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • September 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • September 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Approval - BK]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • June 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
October, 2020
  • October 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
April, 2020
  • April 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Sell]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Expedite Hearing - BK]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Disclosure Statement]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
January, 2020
  • January 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • December 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Response to Motion]
  • December 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Complaints Deadline]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Convert Case Chapter 11 to Chapter 7]
November, 2019
  • November 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Individual/Joint)]
  • September 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • September 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Change Venue]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Change Venue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.