U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60946-
  • Case Name: LANAY N . KAPPERUD and CATHY J. KAPPERUD
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 12 Case]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 12 Case]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
December, 2024
  • December 24, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
January, 2023
  • January 08, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 08, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 07, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 07, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deeming Claim Satisfied]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deeming Claim Satisfied]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion Deeming Claim Satisfied (Hearing Required)]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion Deeming Claim Satisfied (Hearing Required)]
July, 2022
  • July 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • July 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Leave to Incur Debt ]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Leave to Incur Debt ]
  • June 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Leave to Incur Debt]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Leave to Incur Debt]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
  • April 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • April 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
February, 2021
  • February 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • February 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Modification of Plan]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • November 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • November 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • November 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • November 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
October, 2020
  • October 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion]
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • August 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
February, 2020
  • February 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Assume/Reject Lease]
  • February 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Assume/Reject Lease]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Assume/Reject Lease]
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Assume/Reject Lease]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Assume/Reject Lease]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Assume/Reject Lease]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion For Joint Administration]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion For Joint Administration]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Joint Administration]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Joint Administration]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
December, 2019
  • December 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • December 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • December 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice of Claim Filing Pursuant to Rule 3004]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Notice of Claim Filing Pursuant to Rule 3004]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • December 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • December 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Chapter 12 Plan Pre-Confirmation Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Chapter 12 Plan Pre-Confirmation Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
November, 2019
  • November 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Participate in ASCS Program]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Participate in ASCS Program]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • October 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Participate in ASCS Program]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • October 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Individual/Joint)]
  • September 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Joint Administration]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Individual/Joint)]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Add Judge]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Application/Motion to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.