U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60947-
  • Case Name: D, B & J, INC.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion For Joint Administration]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion For Joint Administration]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion For Joint Administration]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Joint Administration]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [Joint Administration]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Joint Administration]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
December, 2019
  • December 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • December 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • December 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Notice of Claim Filing Pursuant to Rule 3004]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [Notice of Claim Filing Pursuant to Rule 3004]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice of Claim Filing Pursuant to Rule 3004]
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection to Motion]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [Objection to Motion]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Objection to Motion]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [Participate in ASCS Program]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Participate in ASCS Program]
  • October 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DESCHENES, GARY S. [Employ]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Participate in ASCS Program]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Time]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Corp./Part.)]
  • September 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Joint Administration]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Corp./Part.)]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.