U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60949-
  • Case Name: MICHAEL RENAE HAGMAN and MONICA MAUREEN HAGMAN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
August, 2020
  • August 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Sale of Property]
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approving Sale of Property]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.