U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00026-
  • Case Name: ADIRA v. JACOBS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • December 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • December 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order for Default Judgment]
  • December 06, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion for Default Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • November 13, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion for Entry of Default]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.