U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60962-
  • Case Name: SANDE FARMS LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Consolidate Case]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Consolidate Case]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Consolidate]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Consolidate]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
December, 2019
  • December 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Consolidate Case]
  • December 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Consolidate Case]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Consolidate]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Consolidate]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • December 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Time]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Consolidate - BK]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Consolidate - BK]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Consolidate - BK]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Consolidate - BK]
October, 2019
  • October 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Participate in ASCS Program]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Participate in ASCS Program]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Corp./Part.)]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Add Judge]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Application/Motion to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.