U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60974-
  • Case Name: CHRISTINE KAY MUNDT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2021
  • November 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 13 Case]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice for Motion for Discharge]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
  • November 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice for Motion for Discharge]
July, 2021
  • July 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Pay]
  • July 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Pay]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Pay ]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Vacate]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.