U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-61006-
  • Case Name: DOMINIC GABRIEL ORTEGA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • October 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • October 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • October 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.