U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60676-
  • Case Name: APEX ENERGY, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Final Decree]
  • October 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Close Adversary Case]
  • October 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Final Decree]
  • September 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Compromise Under Rule 9019]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • August 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Administrative Expenses]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Administrative Expenses]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Administrative Expenses]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Administrative Expenses]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order (Generic)]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Administrative Expenses]
  • January 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Continue Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Administrative Expenses]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Administrative Expenses]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Administrative Expenses]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Administrative Expenses]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approving Stipulation]
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approving Stipulation]
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Administrative Expenses]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approving Stipulation]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
March, 2020
  • March 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Correspondence]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement and Setting Ch. 11 Plan Confirmation Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Assume/Reject Lease]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Assume/Reject Lease]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Record of Exhibits]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Motion]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • December 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Expedite Hearing - BK]
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [2004 Examination]
  • November 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • November 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.)]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Converting Case]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.)]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case 7 to 11]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.