U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00030-
  • Case Name: WOMACK v. RJC INVESTMENT, INC.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 12, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • April 10, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 10, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Dismissing Proceedings]
  • April 02, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • March 05, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 03, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 03, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 25, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • February 07, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response to Motion]
  • February 06, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • February 04, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion - ADV]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion for Summary Judgment - ADV]
  • January 10, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - ADV]
  • October 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.