U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-61078-
  • Case Name: ROY E PACK
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Dismissing Case under 521(i)]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Trustee's Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Converting Case]
  • December 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • December 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Convert Case to 13]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 13]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
October, 2019
  • October 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.