U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00034-
  • Case Name: Abbott et al v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [To File Sealed Motion/Document]
  • August 28, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding ]
  • August 27, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to File Sealed Motion/Document]
  • August 27, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 24, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 06, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial]
  • March 04, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Trial]
  • March 04, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 27, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Entered in Error - ADV]
  • February 27, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • February 27, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response to Motion]
  • February 26, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 23, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 11, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • January 09, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding ]
  • January 08, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 06, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • January 04, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 02, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion - ADV]
  • December 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion - ADV]
  • December 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • December 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • November 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.