U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-61079-
  • Case Name: DEREK LYNN SANDE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Modification of Plan]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
March, 2021
  • March 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Confirm Termination or Absence of Stay]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Confirm Termination or Absence of Stay]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Leave to Incur Debt ]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Leave to Incur Debt ]
  • February 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • February 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Judicial Notice]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Judicial Notice]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Time]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Time]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reconsider]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reconsider]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Reconsider - BK]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Reconsider - BK]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • March 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Judicial Notice]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Judicial Notice]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Approval - BK]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Approval - BK]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection to Motion]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Objection to Motion]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • February 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • February 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Valuation of Secured Claim]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Valuation of Secured Claim]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Chapter 12 Plan Pre-Confirmation Hearing]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Chapter 12 Plan Pre-Confirmation Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Time]
  • January 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • January 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection to Motion]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Objection to Motion]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Consolidate]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Consolidate]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Expedite Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Expedite Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Shorten Time]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Shorten Time]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Expedite Hearing - BK]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Expedite Hearing - BK]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Participate in ASCS Program]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Participate in ASCS Program]
December, 2019
  • December 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Consolidate Case]
  • December 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Consolidate Case]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Consolidate]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Consolidate]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Participate in ASCS Program]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Participate in ASCS Program]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Consolidate - BK]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Consolidate - BK]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • December 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • November 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Consolidate - BK]
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Consolidate - BK]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • November 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Individual/Joint)]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Individual/Joint)]
  • October 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • October 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.