U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00035-
  • Case Name: HARRIMAN et al v. NARULA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • November 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion for Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response to Motion]
  • October 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Judicial Notice]
  • October 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion - BK]
  • October 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • October 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion for Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion - ADV]
  • October 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.