U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-61084
  • Case Name: LUCKY BUMS SUBSIDIARY LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Final Decree]
  • April 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
  • April 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Final Decree]
October, 2020
  • October 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • September 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ballot Report]
April, 2020
  • April 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
December, 2019
  • December 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
  • October 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.)]
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.