U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-61099
  • Case Name: SUNNY DAWN KLOEPFER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Vacating Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
November, 2019
  • November 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • November 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application of Chapter 7 fee waiver under USC 28:1930(f)]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.