U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-61107-
  • Case Name: NATHAN EVERETT LEWIS and PAMELA TIFFANY JEAN LEWIS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Complaints Deadline]
  • March 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Delay Discharge]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Delay Discharge]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
February, 2020
  • February 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Delay Discharge]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Delay Discharge]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Terminate original trustee and appoint new trustee]
  • November 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.