U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-61112-
  • Case Name: JEREMY DANIEL GIBBS and JESSICA ANGEL WALLACE GIBBS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 13)]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch. 13 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 13 Case]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
  • December 03, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice for Motion for Discharge]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice for Motion for Discharge]
March, 2021
  • March 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 13)]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
December, 2019
  • December 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • November 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.