U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-61127-
  • Case Name: STACY L. McELDERRY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2021
  • June 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • June 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Turnover]
January, 2020
  • January 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • December 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
November, 2019
  • November 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.