U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-61144-
  • Case Name: GLEN PHILLIP FOSTER and HEATHER LEA FOSTER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2020
  • January 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.