U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00028-
  • Case Name: MILLER v. MONTANA STATE UNIVERSITY-BILLINGS et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 07, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
November, 2019
  • November 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.