U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-61154-
  • Case Name: PRIMESOURCE INCORPORATED
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion - BK]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Final Decree]
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree]
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Final Decree]
  • March 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • March 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation]
  • March 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Assume/Reject Lease]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Continue Hearing]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Prohibit the Use of Cash Collateral]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Adequate Protection]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • November 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.)]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.