U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60013-
  • Case Name: GARY LEE JACKSON (deceased) and CONSTANCE FAYE JACKSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • November 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
March, 2020
  • March 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignmen/Transfer of Claim]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.