U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-61188-
  • Case Name: APRIL RENEE RITCHEY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
March, 2020
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Vacating Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • December 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application of Chapter 7 fee waiver under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • December 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • November 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • November 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.